+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-240
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary II
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 153A
- 153A-15
- 153A-14.5