+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/02/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
May 2, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor