+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Vote
March 1, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor