+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-247
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2013
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 115C -
- 143B -
- 115C-150.11 -
- 115C-150.12 -
- 115C-150.13 -
- 115C-150.14 -
- 143B-138.1 -
- 143B-146.1 -
- 143B-146.15 -
- 143B-146.2 -
- 143B-146.21 -
- 143B-146.8 -
- 143C-6-4 -
- 15C-383 -
+ − Votes (3)
June 20, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 14
June 17, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor