+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/23/2019
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
July 23, 2019: Second Reading M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5