+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-111
- Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2015
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
- Reptd Fav
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Public Utilities, if favorable, Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3