+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-23
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/14/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Banking
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 53C
- 53C-1-4
- 53C-2-1
- 53
- 53-208.42
- 53-208.48
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 14, 2017: Motion 12/Appeal Ruling of the Chair Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 74
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1