+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-401
- Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/25/2013
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
- Engrossed
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/23/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 44A -
- 115C -
- 143 -
- 115C-521 -
- 143-128 -
- 143-128.1 -
- 143-128.1A -
- 143-128.1B -
- 143-128.1C -
- 143-64.31 -
- 143-64.32 -
- 44A-16 -
+ − Votes (4)
July 23, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5
July 23, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
July 23, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor