+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
+ − Vote
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor