+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 10/23/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-287
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/24/2015
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 1E-1
- 1E-2
- 1E-3
- 1E-4
- 1E-5
- 1E
+ − Votes (2)
September 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor