+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 115C-112.2 -
- 115C-112.3 -
- 115C-112.4 -
- 115C-112.5 -
- 120-19 -
- 120-19.1 -
- 120-19.4 -
- 120-3.1 -
- 143A-48.2 -
- 143B-146.1 -
- 143B-146.15 -
- 143B-146.2 -
- 143B-146.21 -
- 143B-146.8 -
+ − Vote
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor