+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-115
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2021
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On August 11, 2021 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On August 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/11/2021
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
- Conf Com Reported
On August 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 08/16/2021
- Conf Com Reported
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/17/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
August 17, 2021: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
August 11, 2021: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor