+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-191
- Signed by Gov. 7/27/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
- Ratified
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 20
- 20-7
- 17C-6
- 17E-4
- 17C
- 17E
+ − Votes (4)
June 27, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
June 22, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 6, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor