+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 115C -
- 115C-238.29F -
- 115C-238.66 -
- 115C-375.2A -
+ − Vote
April 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor