+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed 07/11/2022
- Received from the Governor
On July 1, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2022
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2022: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 108
- Absent: 12
June 30, 2022: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor