+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-199
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/30/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2015
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/15/2015
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 130A
- 130A-33.52
- 130A-33.53
+ − Votes (3)
July 28, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Absent: 14
July 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor