+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 95
- 95-78
- 95-79
- 95-80
- 95-81
- 95-82
- 95-83
- 95-84
- C-10-
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor