+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 4/9/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-7
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 4/1/2021
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received From Senate
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 02/24/2021
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2021: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor