+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-43
- Signed by Gov. 6/2/2015
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2015
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/21/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/24/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/19/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Reptd Fav
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Children, Youth, and Families, if favorable, Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4
May 13, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
March 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor