+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary III
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 95
- 95-241
- 95-28.3
+ − Vote
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor