+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor