+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/08/2013
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/02/2013
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/30/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor