+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 29, 2016: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 11
June 29, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor