+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/12/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor