+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (42)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 2/24/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-5
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 2/17/2022
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Conf Com Reported
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
- Conferees Reappointed
- Conf Com Dismissed
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 09/23/2021
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On August 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2022: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 120
February 17, 2022: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor