+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-189
On July 31, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2015
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 132
- 132-1.7A
+ − Votes (2)
July 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor