+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-90
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2015
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2015
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2015
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A4
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Environment
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 113A
- 159G
- 113A-10
- 113A-11
- 113A-12
- 113A-4
- 113A-9
- 159G-38
- 143-215.22L
- 143
+ − Votes (13)
June 4, 2015: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2015: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
May 28, 2015: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 11
May 26, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
May 26, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
May 26, 2015: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
May 26, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: A2 Catlin Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: A4 Millis Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: A1 Torbett Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: A3 Harrison Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3