+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 136 -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 136-166.50 -
- 136-166.51 -
- 136-166.52 -
- 136-166.53 -
- 136-166.54 -
- 136-166.55 -
- 143-765 -
- 143-766 -
- 143-767 -
- 153A-145.7 -
- 160A-205.3 -
- 143 -
+ − Vote
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8