+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-25
- Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2015
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
March 11, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor