+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
- Ch. SL 2018-28
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 105 -
- 115C -
- 115C-218 -
- 115C-218.110 -
- 115C-218.115 -
- 115C-218.45 -
- 115C-218.7 -
- 115C-218.8 -
- 105-275 -
- 115C-217.7 -
- 18B -
- 18B-600 -
+ − Votes (5)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
April 26, 2017: A1 Brody Second Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: A2 Brockman Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor