+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 26, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor