+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (59)
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-206
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 08/30/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 08/29/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 08/25/2017
- Veto received from House
On August 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/24/2017
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 14, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Governor
- Vetoed 08/14/2017
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/4/2017
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On August 3, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On August 3, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Environment
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 143
- 150B-21.1
- 143-215.72
- 113
- 130A
- 113-168.4
- 113-201
- 113-201.1
- 113-203
- 130A-309.09B
- 143-215.73F
- 143-215.73M
- 18C
- 45
- 90
- 105
- 115C
- 105-288
- 115C-83.15
- 115C-83.16
- 120-121
- 18C-112
- 45-10
- 90-2
+ − Votes (11)
August 30, 2017: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 11
August 24, 2017: Veto Override
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
August 3, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 7
August 3, 2017: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 9
June 28, 2017: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 27, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: A2 Hall, K. Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2017: A1 Hall, K. Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1