+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-91
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2019
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2019: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
June 26, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor