+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 9/10/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-144
On September 1, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 9/1/2021
On August 31, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 30, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On August 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
August 31, 2021: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 15
August 26, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor