+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-141
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2013
- Ratified
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
- Reptd Fav
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4