+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-140
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/30/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 50
- 52
- 50-16.6
- 52-10
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 30, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1