+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Failed A7
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amend Failed A6
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A8
- Amend Failed A9
- Amend Failed A10
- Amend Adopted A11
- Amend Adopted A12
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/05/2015
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ruled Material
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Statutes Amended (49)
- 113 -
- 130A -
- 143 -
- 150B -
- 160A -
- 113-136 -
- 120-70.101 -
- 130A-248 -
- 143-143.10A -
- 143-214.18 -
- 143-214.19 -
- 143-214.23 -
- 143-214.27 -
- 143-214.7 -
- 150B-21.3A -
- 160A-381 -
- 62 -
- 87 -
- 93B -
- 97 -
- 153A -
- 113-174.3 -
- 113-224 -
- 128-1.1 -
- 130A-334 -
- 130A-335 -
- 130A-336 -
- 130A-336.1 -
- 130A-338 -
- 130A-339 -
- 130A-342 -
- 130A-343 -
- 153A-346 -
- 153A-349.3 -
- 153A-349.4 -
- 153A-352 -
- 153A-356 -
- 160A-272 -
- 160A-390 -
- 160A-400.22 -
- 160A-400.23 -
- 160A-412 -
- 160A-416 -
- 62-133.8 -
- 62-156 -
- 62-3 -
- 87-129 -
- 93B-8.2 -
- 97-2 -
+ − Votes (14)
May 6, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A11 Arp Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A12 Hager Third Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 11
May 6, 2015: A2 Bell, J. Third Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A3 Millis Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A4 Millis Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A5 Hager Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A6 Harrison Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 70
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A7 Ager Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A8 Brody Third Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A9 Luebke Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 73
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2015: A10 Turner, B. Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 80
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
April 29, 2015: A1 Jeter Second Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor