+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-35
- Signed by Gov. 4/24/2013
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 4/19/2013
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/12/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee C, if favorable, Appropriations
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 14 -
- 15A -
- 14-318.4 -
- 15A-1382.1 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor