+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Tabled A7
- Amend Tabled A6
- Amend Tabled A5
- Amend Tabled A4
- Amend Tabled A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Statutes Amended (49)
- 14
- 74E
- 74G
- 113
- 113-136
- 14-269
- 14-269.1
- 14-269.2
- 14-269.3
- 14-288.8
- 14-401.24
- 14-402
- 14-405
- 14-407.1
- 14-409.40
- 14-415.10A
- 14-415.11
- 14-415.12
- 14-415.22
- 14-415.35
- 14-415.36
- 14-415.37
- 14-415.38
- 14-415.39
- 14-415.4
- 14-415.40
- 14-415.41
- 14-415.42
- 74E-6
- 74G-6
- 106-503.2
- 115C-81.90
- 115C-81.95
- 120-32.1
- 122C-54
- 14-269.4
- 14-277.2
- 14-277.6
- 14-404
- 14-415.10
- 14-415.13
- 14-415.15
- 14-415.19
- 15-11.1
- 15
- 106
- 115C
- 120
- 122C
+ − Votes (10)
June 8, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 5
June 7, 2017: A2 Harrison Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 75
June 7, 2017: A3 Butler M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 6
June 7, 2017: A4 Morey M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 4
June 7, 2017: A5 Cunningham M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
June 7, 2017: A1 Millis Second Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 28
June 7, 2017: A7 Holley M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 2
June 7, 2017: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2017: A6 John M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor