+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2