+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 22, 2016 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2016-105
- Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016
- Ratified
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3