+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 04/28/2015
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor