+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 120-19
- 120-19.1
- 120-19.4
- 120-3.1.
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 4