+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 18B
- 18B-302.1
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2017: A1 Richardson, W. Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2