+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Failed A1
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/15/2013
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2013: A1 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2013: A2 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 73
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor