+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 10/1/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-267
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/30/2015
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary II
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 15A
- 143B
- 143B-911
- 143B-930
- 15A-502
+ − Votes (3)
September 29, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
September 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor