+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 6, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor