+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 90
- 90-153.1
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2015: A1 Setzer Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2