+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-117
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reptd Fav To Concur
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Finance
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- 90
- 90-143.4
- 90-154
- 90-155
- 93A
- 90-13.1
- 90-13.2
- 90-14
- 90-14.13
- 90-14.2
- 90-16
- 90-2
- 90-21.22
- 90-240
- 90-245
- 90-246
- 90-249
- 90-3
- 90-5.2
- 90-8.1
- 93A-4
+ − Votes (3)
July 1, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 9
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor