+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A3
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/24/2013
On July 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/23/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Failed A1
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Education
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
+ − Votes (8)
July 24, 2013: M4 Previous Question
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
July 24, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
July 23, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
July 23, 2013: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 1
July 19, 2013: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 15
July 19, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 15
July 19, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 15
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor